Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick MacKenna

Deceased

Bishop of Clogher, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1868Born
14 Oct 189527.1Ordained PriestPriest of Clogher, Ireland
1 Jun 190940.8AppointedBishop of Clogher, Ireland
10 Oct 190941.1Ordained BishopBishop of Clogher, Ireland
7 Feb 194273.4DiedBishop of Clogher, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Patrick MacKenna
Bishop Patrick MacKenna (born , died ) Bishop of Clogher

EventPlace
Birth PlaceErrigal, Truagh

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018