Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Henry

Deceased

Bishop of Down and Connor, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1846Born
7 Jun 187024.0Ordained PriestPriest of Down and Connor, Ireland
6 Aug 189549.2AppointedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
22 Sep 189549.3Ordained BishopBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
8 Mar 190861.7DiedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Henry Henry (VIAF: 315688628)
Bishop Henry Henry (born , died ) Bishop of Down and Connor

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLoughuile, Diocese of Down and Connor
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Belfast

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 254
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jun 2017