Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Keys O’Doherty

Deceased

Bishop of Derry


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1833BornTemplemore
1861¹27.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 Dec 188956.3AppointedBishop of Derry, Ireland
2 Mar 189056.4Ordained BishopBishop of Derry, Ireland
25 Feb 190773.4DiedBishop of Derry, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Keys O’Doherty:
Bishop John Keys O’Doherty (born , died ) Bishop of Derry

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 242

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013