Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Owens

Deceased

Bishop of Clogher, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1840Born
22 Jun 186626.4Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jul 189454.5AppointedBishop of Clogher, Ireland
26 Aug 189454.6Ordained BishopBishop of Clogher, Ireland
3 Mar 190969.1DiedBishop of Clogher, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Richard Owens
Bishop Richard Owens (born , died ) Bishop of Clogher

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrookeboro, Co Fermanagh
Ordained BishopCathedral, Monaghan

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 211
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017