Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Kühner y Kühner, M.F.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop of Huánuco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1914BornBachenau, Germany
29 Jun 193824.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
15 May 195844.0AppointedPrelate of Tarma, Peru
30 Sep 196450.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Avioccala
8 Nov 196450.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Avioccala
29 Nov 197763.6ResignedTitular Bishop of Avioccala
24 Jul 198066.2AppointedBishop of Huánuco, Peru
22 Jan 199176.7DiedBishop of Huánuco, Peru

MicroData Summary for Antonio Kühner y Kühner:
Bishop Antonio Kühner y Kühner M.F.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop of Huánuco

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013