Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Herre

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rottenburg-Stuttgart, Germany

Titular Bishop of Calatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1910Born
6 Apr 193524.3Ordained PriestPriest of Rottenburg, Germany
12 Oct 197059.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rottenburg, Germany
12 Oct 197059.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Calatia
14 Nov 197059.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Calatia
31 Dec 198575.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Rottenburg-Stuttgart, Germany
24 Sep 199382.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rottenburg-Stuttgart, Germany

MicroData Summary for Anton Herre (VIAF: 171456647)
Bishop Anton Herre (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rottenburg-Stuttgart

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDietenheim
Ordained BishopS. Eberhard, Church, Stuttgart, Diocese of Rottenburg

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 730

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast