Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maxime Decelles

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1849Born
21 Jul 187223.2Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada
14 Jan 189343.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada
14 Jan 189343.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Druzipara
9 Mar 189343.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Druzipara
24 May 190152.0SucceededBishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada
8 Jul 190556.1DiedBishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Maxime Decelles (VIAF: 317273878)
Bishop Maxime Decelles (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Hyacinthe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Damase, Diocese of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec
Ordained BishopSaint-Hyacinthe, Diocese of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec
Death PlaceSaint-Hyacinthe, Diocese of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Saint-Hyacinthe, Diocese of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec

  • a priest for 32.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 251, and Page 311
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 19 Sep 2017