Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Simon-Herman Brunault

Deceased

Bishop of Nicolet, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1857Born
29 Jun 188225.4Ordained PriestPriest of Nicolet, Québec, Canada
30 Sep 189942.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nicolet, Québec, Canada
30 Sep 189942.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tubunae in Mauretania
27 Dec 189942.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tubunae in Mauretania
28 Jan 190447.0SucceededBishop of Nicolet, Québec, Canada
21 Oct 193780.7DiedBishop of Nicolet, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Simon-Herman Brunault (VIAF: 316927841)
Bishop Joseph-Simon-Herman Brunault (born , died ) Bishop of Nicolet

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-David, Diocese of Nicolet, Québec
Ordained BishopNicolet, Diocese of Nicolet, Québec
Death PlaceNicolet, Diocese of Nicolet, Québec

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 37.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 412, and Page 570
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 19 Sep 2017