Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ovidio Lari

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aosta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1919Born
10 Aug 194122.6Ordained PriestPriest of Volterra, Italy
15 Oct 196849.7AppointedBishop of Aosta, Italy
30 Nov 196849.9Ordained BishopBishop of Aosta, Italy
8 Dec 196849.9InstalledBishop of Aosta, Italy
30 Dec 199475.9RetiredBishop of Aosta, Italy
2 Feb 200788.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Aosta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ovidio Lari
Bishop Ovidio Lari (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aosta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFabbrica di Peccioli, Diocese of Volterra
Ordained BishopCathedral, Volterra, Diocese of Volterra
Death PlaceFabbrica di Peccioli, Diocese of Volterra
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Aosta, Diocese of Aosta
Buried Place (Current)Cathedral, Aosta, Diocese of Aosta

  • a priest for 65.4 years
  • a bishop for 38.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 284
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Mar 2021

Quantcast