Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franco Lovignana

Bishop of Aosta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1957 Born
21 Jun 198123.5Ordained PriestPriest of Aosta, Italy
9 Nov 201153.9AppointedBishop of Aosta, Italy
18 Dec 201154.0Ordained BishopBishop of Aosta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Franco Lovignana
Bishop Franco Lovignana (born ) Bishop of Aosta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAosta, Diocese of Aosta

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Aosta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c1: Bollettino, 9 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2: CB, 9 Nov 2011
  • c34: CB, 9 Dec 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,193

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast