Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dante Carlo Munerati, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Volterra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1869BornBagnolo San Vito
17 Dec 189425.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
20 Dec 192354.2AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
29 Jan 192454.3Ordained BishopBishop of Volterra, Italy
13 Jul 192454.8InstalledBishop of Volterra, Italy
20 Dec 194273.2DiedBishop of Volterra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Dante Carlo Munerati:
Bishop Dante Carlo Munerati S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Volterra

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013