Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Fausto Vallainc

Deceased

Bishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1916Born
4 Jun 194023.6Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jul 197053.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Siena, Italy
4 Jul 197053.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Frequentium
8 Aug 197053.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Frequentium
7 Oct 197558.9AppointedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
8 Dec 198670.1DiedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Fausto Vallainc
Bishop Angelo Fausto Vallainc (born , died ) Bishop of Alba (Pompea)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChamporcher
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Traspontina, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 535
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 98, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Jul 2021

Quantcast