Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marcello Cardinal Lante della Rovere

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1561¹BornRome
11 Sep 160645.6Elevated to Cardinal
9 Oct 160645.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta
18 Dec 160645.9AppointedBishop of Todi, Italy
14 Jan 160746.0Ordained BishopBishop of Todi, Italy
6 Oct 162564.7ResignedBishop of Todi, Italy
20 Mar 162867.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
20 Aug 162968.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
8 Oct 162968.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
28 Mar 163978.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
1 Jul 164180.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
19 Apr 165291.2DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Marcello Lante della Rovere:
Marcello Cardinal Lante della Rovere (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a bishop for 45.2 years
  • a cardinal for 45.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Sep 1606
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 10
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1607, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Feb 2015