Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Timocrate (Democrate) Aloigi (Aloisi)

Deceased

Bishop of Cagli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1543¹BornApecchio
14 May 160764.4AppointedBishop of Cagli, Italy
20 May 160764.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cagli, Italy
17 Feb 1610³67.1DiedBishop of Cagli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Timocrate (Democrate) Aloigi (Aloisi):
Bishop Timocrate (Democrate) Aloigi (Aloisi) (died ) Bishop of Cagli

  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 129
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 43, Number 232

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013