Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Mauro, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nusco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1594¹BornLa Fratta
13 Jan 164248.0AppointedBishop of Nusco, Italy
26 Jan 164248.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nusco, Italy
1 Nov 164450.8DiedBishop of Nusco, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Mauro:
Bishop Giovanni Mauro O.F.M. Conv. (died ) Bishop of Nusco

  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 263
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1642, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 19 Mar 2015