Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Cresconi

Deceased

Bishop of Caserta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1604¹BornNapoli
28 Mar 163935.2AppointedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
10 Apr 163935.2Ordained BishopBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
6 May 164743.3AppointedBishop of Caserta, Italy
16 Apr 166056.2DiedBishop of Caserta, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Cresconi:
Bishop Bartolomeo Cresconi (born 1604, died ) Bishop of Caserta

  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 352, and Page 138
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 103, Number 622
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1639, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015