Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Defendente Brusati

Deceased

Bishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Sep 1633AppointedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
9 Oct 1633Ordained BishopBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
22 Nov 1647DiedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy

MicroData Summary for Defendente Brusati
Bishop Defendente Brusati (died ) Bishop of San Marco (Argentano)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNovara, Diocese of Novara
Ordained BishopPaoline Chapel, Santa Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 231
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1633, Number 35
  • ob/c2: AT, 20 Jan 2017
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,271

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast