Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriele Naro (Nari), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of San Marco (Argentano)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580¹BornRoma
13 Nov 161333.8AppointedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
13 Dec 161333.9Ordained BishopBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
16 Nov 162343.8DiedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriele Naro (Nari):
Bishop Gabriele Naro (Nari) O.P. (died ) Bishop of San Marco (Argentano)

  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 231
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 56, Number 315
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1613, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Feb 2015