Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Consoli, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sora, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1544¹Born
12 Jan 160965.0AppointedBishop of Sora, Italy
25 Jan 160965.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sora, Italy
31 Aug 1609³65.6DiedBishop of Sora, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael Consoli
Bishop Michael Consoli C.R. (born 1544, died ) Bishop of Sora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarletta

  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 319
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 45, Number 244
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1609, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast