Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Orazio Cardinal Maffei

Deceased

Archbishop of Chieti

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580BornRome
11 Sep 160626.7Elevated to Cardinal
9 Oct 160626.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giorgio in Velabro
7 Feb 160727.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
3 Sep 160727.7AppointedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
16 Sep 160727.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
11 Jan 160929.0DiedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Orazio Maffei:
Cardinal Orazio Maffei (died ) Archbishop of Chieti

  • a bishop for 1.3 years
  • a cardinal for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 332
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 44, Number 236

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013