Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gregorio Cardinal Naro

Deceased

Bishop of Rieti

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1581BornRome
19 Nov 162948.9Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 162949.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta
6 Feb 163453.1AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
7 Aug 163453.6DiedBishop of Rieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Naro:
Cardinal Gregorio Naro (died ) Bishop of Rieti

  • a cardinal for 4.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Nov 1629
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 293

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013