Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Hollak

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów

Titular Bishop of Arad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1812BornKrawniskiz
3 Dec 183725.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 188371.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland
15 Mar 188371.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Arad
27 May 188371.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arad
27 Oct 189078.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów, Poland

MicroData Summary for Józef Hollak:
Bishop Józef Hollak (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Sejny o Sejna o Augustów

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,789
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 115
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,865
  • d: CB, 22 Feb 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013