Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adolf Fritzen (Fitzen)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Strasbourg, France

Titular Archbishop of Mocissus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1838Born
16 Aug 186224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
24 Jan 189152.4SelectedBishop of Strasbourg, France
1 Jun 189152.8ConfirmedBishop of Strasbourg, France
21 Jul 189152.9Ordained BishopBishop of Strasbourg, France
31 Jul 191980.9RetiredBishop of Strasbourg, France
31 Jul 191980.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mocissus
7 Sep 191981.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Strasbourg, France

MicroData Summary for Adolf Fritzen (Fitzen) (VIAF: 80374026)
Archbishop Adolf Fritzen (Fitzen) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Strasbourg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKleve, Diocese of Münster, Germany
Ordained BishopCathedral, Strasbourg, Diocese of Strasbourg

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 120
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017