Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Feiten

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

Titular Bishop of Amyzon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1835Born
27 Aug 185923.9Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
20 Sep 188752.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
20 Sep 188752.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyzon
20 Nov 188752.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amyzon
17 Feb 189256.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Feiten (VIAF: 308715199)
Bishop Heinrich Feiten (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBengel, Diocese of Trier
Ordained BishopTrier, Diocese of Trier

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 97
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017