Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Baptist von Anzer, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southern Shantung {Scian-Ton Meridionale}, China

Titular Bishop of Thelepte


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1851Born
1875¹23.6ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Word
15 Aug 187625.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
4 Jan 188230.6AppointedSuperior of Southern Shantung {Scian-Ton Meridionale}, China
12 Jan 188634.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Shantung {Scian-Ton Meridionale}, China
12 Jan 188634.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thelepte
24 Jan 188634.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thelepte
24 Nov 190352.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Southern Shantung {Scian-Ton Meridionale}, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Baptist von Anzer (VIAF: 20518119)
Bishop Johann Baptist von Anzer S.V.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southern Shantung {Scian-Ton Meridionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWeinried, Diocese of Regensburg, Germany
Ordained BishopSt. Michel, Steyl, Netherlands

  • a priest for 27.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 546
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 May 2017