Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Ernst Schrod

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

Titular Bishop of Basilinopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1841BornBickendorf
27 Aug 186423.5Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
17 Apr 189453.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
17 Apr 189453.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Basilinopolis
6 May 189453.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Basilinopolis
10 Apr 191473.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Karl Ernst Schrod:
Bishop Karl Ernst Schrod (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 143

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 15 Jan 2014