Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Kaspar Drobe

Deceased

Bishop of Paderborn, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1808Born
9 Aug 183123.4Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
24 Mar 188274.1AppointedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
25 Jun 188274.3Ordained BishopBishop of Paderborn, Germany
7 Mar 189183.0DiedBishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Kaspar Drobe (VIAF: 238555785)
Bishop Franz Kaspar Drobe (born , died ) Bishop of Paderborn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMenden, Diocese of Paderborn
Ordained BishopCathedral, Paderborn, Diocese of Paderborn

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 435
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017