Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph-Marie Raya

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel

Titular Archbishop of Scythopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1916Born
20 Jul 194124.9Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 196852.0AppointedArchbishop of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel
20 Oct 196852.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel
21 Aug 197458.0ResignedArchbishop of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel
21 Aug 197458.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Scythopolis
10 Jun 200588.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Marie Raya (VIAF: 28580437)
Archbishop Joseph-Marie Raya (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZahleh
Ordained PriestJerusalem

  • a priest for 63.8 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 9 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast