Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerald Nicholas Dino

Bishop Emeritus of Holy Protection of Mary of Phoenix (Ruthenian), Arizona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1940 BornBinghamton, NY
21 Mar 196525.1Ordained PriestPriest of Passaic (Ruthenian), New Jersey, USA
6 Dec 200767.9AppointedBishop of Van Nuys (Ruthenian), California, USA
27 Mar 200868.2Ordained BishopBishop of Van Nuys (Ruthenian), California, USA
7 May 201676.3RetiredBishop of Holy Protection of Mary of Phoenix (Ruthenian), Arizona, USA

MicroData Summary for Gerald Nicholas Dino
Bishop Gerald Nicholas Dino (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Holy Protection of Mary of Phoenix

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Holy Protection of Mary of Phoenix (Ruthenian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Dec 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,691
  • r: Bollettino, 7 May 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 May 2016