Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean Bassoul, B.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1920BornMaghdouché
11 Jul 194323.1Ordained PriestPriest of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
5 Dec 196141.5SelectedArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Jabrud) (Melkite Greek), Syria
26 Jan 196241.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Jabrud) (Melkite Greek), Syria
28 Apr 196241.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Jabrud) (Melkite Greek), Syria
21 Aug 197151.2AppointedArchbishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
9 Aug 197757.2DiedArchbishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Jean Bassoul:
Archbishop Jean Bassoul B.S. (born , died ) Archbishop of Zahleh e Furzol

  • a priest for 34.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015