Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Norbert Mary Leonard James Dorsey, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Orlando, Florida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1929BornSpringfield, MA
15 Aug 194919.6Solemn ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Passion
28 Apr 195626.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
10 Jan 198656.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Miami, Florida, USA
10 Jan 198656.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Mactaris
19 Mar 198656.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mactaris
20 Mar 199060.2AppointedBishop of Orlando, Florida, USA
25 May 199060.4InstalledBishop of Orlando, Florida, USA
13 Nov 200474.9RetiredBishop of Orlando, Florida, USA
21 Feb 201383.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Orlando, Florida, USA

MicroData Summary for Norbert Mary Leonard James Dorsey:
Bishop Norbert Mary Leonard James Dorsey C.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Orlando

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 21 Feb 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015