Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Verschuren, S.C.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Helsinki


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1925BornBreda
19 Mar 195024.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
21 Apr 196439.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Helsinki, Finland
21 Apr 196439.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Sirenses
16 Aug 196439.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Sirenses
29 Jun 196742.2SucceededBishop of Helsinki, Finland
18 Sep 199873.4ResignedBishop of Helsinki, Finland
19 Feb 200074.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Helsinki, Finland

MicroData Summary for Paul Verschuren:
Bishop Paul Verschuren S.C.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Helsinki

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015