Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nikola Nino Kekić

Bishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1943 BornStari Grad
1 Nov 197027.8Ordained PriestPriest of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
25 May 200966.4AppointedBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
4 Jul 200966.5Ordained BishopBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Nikola Nino Kekić:
Bishop Nikola Nino Kekić (born ) Bishop of Križevci (Kreutz)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 May 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,244

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013