Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mario Roberto Cassari

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Malta

Titular Archbishop of Truentum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1943Born
27 Dec 196926.3Ordained PriestPriest
3 Aug 199955.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Truentum
3 Aug 199955.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Congo, Republic of
3 Aug 199955.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Gabon
16 Oct 199956.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Truentum
31 Jul 200460.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Côte d’Ivoire
31 Jul 200460.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Burkina Faso
8 Sep 200461.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Niger
12 Jun 200763.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Burkina Faso
12 Jun 200763.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Niger
14 Feb 200864.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Croatia
10 Mar 201268.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to South Africa
10 Mar 201268.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Botswana
10 Mar 201268.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Namibia
10 Mar 201268.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Swaziland
17 Mar 201268.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Lesotho
22 May 201571.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Malta
Dec 2016²73.2RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Malta
19 Aug 201773.9DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Malta

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mario Roberto Cassari
Archbishop Mario Roberto Cassari (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Malta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGhilarza, Italy
Death PlaceDonigala Fenughedu, Archdiocese of Oristano, Italy

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,640
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Mar 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Mar 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 May 2015
  • r: CB, 4 Apr 2017
  • d: CB, 19 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Aug 2017