Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gabriel Bukatko

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia

Apostolic Administrator of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1913Born
2 Apr 193926.1Ordained PriestPriest of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
23 Feb 195239.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
23 Feb 195239.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Severiana
27 Apr 195239.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Severiana
22 Jul 196047.4AppointedBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
2 Mar 196148.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
2 Mar 196148.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mocissus
4 Apr 196148.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
28 Jun 196148.4AppointedCoadjutor Apostolic Administrator of Jugoslavenska Banat, Serbia
24 Mar 196451.1SucceededArchbishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
24 Mar 196451.1SucceededApostolic Administrator of Jugoslavenska Banat, Serbia
22 Dec 197158.9ResignedApostolic Administrator of Jugoslavenska Banat, Serbia
4 Mar 198067.1ResignedArchbishop of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia
19 Oct 198168.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Beograd (-Smederevo), Serbia

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Bukatko
Archbishop Gabriel Bukatko (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Beograd (-Smederevo)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAndrijevci, Diocese of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
Ordained BishopCathedral, Zagreb, Archdiocese of Zagreb, Croatia

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1952, Number 33
  • c1: CB, 29 May 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 32, Number 1,812
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast