Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Madre di Dio a Mosca (Moscow)

Archidioecesis Moscoviensis Matris Dei



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Paolo Pezzi, F.S.C.B., Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 February 2002
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Russian Federation
  • Square Kilometers: 2,629,000 (1,015,451 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.cathmos.ru/
  • Mailing Address: Roman Catholic Archdiocese, ul. Malaya Gruzinskaya 27, str. 2, 123557 Moskva, Russia
  • Telephone: (495)785.54.34
  • Fax: 785.54.70

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Apostolic Administration of European Russia {Russia Europea}
13 April 1991ErectedDiocese of Vladivostok Apostolic Administration of European Russia {Russia Europea} (erected)
23 November 1999Territory LostApostolic Administration of European Russia {Russia Europea} Apostolic Administration of Southern European Russia {Russia Europea Meridionale} (erected)
Apostolic Administration of Northern European Russia {Russia Europea Settentrionale}
23 November 1999Name ChangedApostolic Administration of European Russia {Russia Europea} Apostolic Administration of Northern European Russia {Russia Europea Settentrionale}
Archdiocese of Madre di Dio a Mosca (Moscow)
11 February 2002ElevatedApostolic Administration of Northern European Russia {Russia Europea Settentrionale} Archdiocese of Madre di Dio a Mosca (Moscow)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Apostolic Administration of Northern European Russia {Russia Europea Settentrionale}
1999200,00058,820,000.3%3754912,19728211561ap2000
2001200,00058,820,000.3%51581091,83428911556ap2002
Archdiocese of Madre di Dio a Mosca (Moscow)
2002200,00058,820,000.3%57651221,63919612358ap2003
2003200,00058,820,000.3%60721321,51511510863ap2004
2004200,00058,820,000.3%66711371,459110812963ap2005
2013200,00058,800,000.3%47761231,626111411662ap2014

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_d, v3.0.5, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 20 Jan 2015