Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adrien-Edmond-Maurice Gand

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lille, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1907Born
17 Dec 193225.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lille, France
29 Jun 193326.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lille, France
19 May 196456.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lille, France
19 May 196456.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Macriana Minor
2 Jul 196457.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Macriana Minor
14 Mar 196860.8SucceededBishop of Lille, France
13 Aug 198376.2RetiredBishop of Lille, France
28 Oct 199083.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Lille, France

MicroData Summary for Adrien-Edmond-Maurice Gand (VIAF: 47923332)
Bishop Adrien-Edmond-Maurice Gand (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lille

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLille, Diocese of Lille
Ordained DeaconSaint-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestSaint-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame de la Treille, Cathedral, Lille, Diocese of Lille
Death PlaceDunkerque, Diocese of Lille

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 17 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jul 2018

Quantcast