Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jules-Louis-Paul Harlé

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer)

Titular Bishop of Arbanum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1916BornWirvignes
24 Dec 193923.9Ordained PriestPriest of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
12 Oct 197054.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
12 Oct 197054.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Arbanum
22 Nov 197054.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arbanum
18 Feb 199175.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
24 Jan 199983.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France

MicroData Summary for Jules-Louis-Paul Harlé:
Bishop Jules-Louis-Paul Harlé (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer)

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013