Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Géry-Jacques-Charles Leuliet

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Amiens, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1910Born
8 Jul 193323.4Ordained PriestPriest of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
14 Feb 196353.0AppointedBishop of Amiens, France
9 May 196353.3Ordained BishopBishop of Amiens, France
15 Jan 198575.0RetiredBishop of Amiens, France
1 Jan 2015104.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Amiens, France

MicroData Summary for Géry-Jacques-Charles Leuliet
Bishop Géry-Jacques-Charles Leuliet (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Amiens

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRichebourg-l'Avoué

  • a priest for 81.4 years
  • a bishop for 51.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: CB, 2 Jan 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast