Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Gustave François Wicquart

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Coutances (-Avranches)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1913BornCalonne-sur-la-Lys
18 Jul 193723.8Ordained PriestPriest
2 Sep 196653.0AppointedBishop of Coutances (-Avranches), France
11 Oct 196653.1Ordained BishopBishop of Coutances (-Avranches), France
3 Nov 198875.1RetiredBishop of Coutances (-Avranches), France
27 Mar 199783.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Coutances (-Avranches), France

MicroData Summary for Joseph Gustave François Wicquart:
Bishop Joseph Gustave François Wicquart (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Coutances (-Avranches)

  • a priest for 59.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 16 Oct 2013