Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Reinaldo del Prette Lissot

Archbishop of Valencia en Venezuela

Apostolic Administrator of San Carlos de Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1952 BornValencia
15 Aug 197624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Valencia en Venezuela
24 Dec 199341.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia en Venezuela
24 Dec 199341.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Altava
5 Feb 199442.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Altava
24 Apr 199745.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Maracay, Venezuela
5 Feb 200351.0SucceededBishop of Maracay, Venezuela
10 Apr 200755.1AppointedArchbishop of Valencia en Venezuela
5 Mar 201462.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of San Carlos de Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Reinaldo del Prette Lissot:
Archbishop Reinaldo del Prette Lissot (born ) Archbishop of Valencia en Venezuela

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Valencia en Venezuela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Apr 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Number 12,247
  • ab: CB, 15 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Apr 2014