Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Ramón Hernández Peña

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trujillo, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1935Born
2 Oct 196025.2Ordained PriestPriest of Trujillo, Venezuela
3 May 197438.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
3 May 197438.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sullectum
25 Jul 197439.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sullectum
28 Jan 197640.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Trujillo, Venezuela
11 Jun 198246.8SucceededBishop of Trujillo, Venezuela
3 Apr 201276.7RetiredBishop of Trujillo, Venezuela
25 Mar 201882.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Trujillo, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Vicente Ramón Hernández Peña (VIAF: 50398223)
Bishop Vicente Ramón Hernández Peña (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Trujillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoconó
Death PlaceParish House, San Jacinto, Trujillo, Diocese of Trujillo

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 43.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Apr 2012
  • d: CB, 25 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 24 May 2018

Quantcast