Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Istvan Hász

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Sura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1884BornKisbér
14 Jul 190823.5Ordained PriestPriest
28 Feb 192944.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sura
28 Apr 192944.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sura
27 Jan 197388.0DiedTitular Bishop of Sura

MicroData Summary for Istvan Hász:
Bishop Istvan Hász (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Sura

  • a priest for 64.5 years
  • a bishop for 43.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015