Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Aloysius Murphy

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cardiff, Wales, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1905Born
21 Mar 193125.2Ordained PriestPriest of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
7 Feb 194842.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
7 Feb 194842.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Appia
25 Feb 194842.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Appia
3 Jun 194943.4SucceededBishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
22 Aug 196155.6AppointedArchbishop of Cardiff, Wales, Great Britain
25 Mar 198377.2RetiredArchbishop of Cardiff, Wales, Great Britain
18 Nov 199589.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cardiff, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Aloysius Murphy (VIAF: 89300027)
Archbishop John Aloysius Murphy (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cardiff

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBirkenhead, Cheshire, Diocese of Shrewsbury, England
Ordained PriestEnglish College, Lisbon, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Ordained BishopSt. Werburgh, Church, Chester, Cheshire, Diocese of Shrewsbury, England
Death PlaceSt. Joseph, Hospital, Newport, Newport, Archdiocese of Cardiff, Wales
Buried Place (Original)St. Joseph, Abbey, Llantarnam, Cwmbran, Torfaen, Archdiocese of Cardiff, Wales

  • a priest for 64.6 years
  • a bishop for 47.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 9
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 157
  • mn: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018
  • c1: CL, 30 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 4 May 2018

Quantcast