Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Ramón Gurruchaga Ezama, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lurín, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1931Born
11 Feb 196129.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
3 Jan 198755.7AppointedBishop of Huaraz, Peru
28 Feb 198755.9Ordained BishopBishop of Huaraz, Peru
14 Dec 199665.7AppointedBishop of Lurín, Peru
17 Jun 200675.2RetiredBishop of Lurín, Peru
11 Apr 201786.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Lurín, Peru

MicroData Summary for José Ramón Gurruchaga Ezama
Bishop José Ramón Gurruchaga Ezama S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lurín

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaracaldo, Spain
Death PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Jun 2006
  • d: CB, 12 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Apr 2017