Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Eduardo Velásquez Tarazona

Bishop of Huaraz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1947 BornCaraz
1 Jul 197325.8Ordained PriestPriest of Huaraz, Peru
15 Mar 199446.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Huaraz, Peru
15 Mar 199446.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Obba
14 May 199446.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Obba
1 Jul 200052.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Tacna y Moquegua, Peru
4 Feb 200456.4AppointedBishop of Huaraz, Peru
27 Apr 200456.7InstalledBishop of Huaraz, Peru

MicroData Summary for José Eduardo Velásquez Tarazona:
Bishop José Eduardo Velásquez Tarazona (born ) Bishop of Huaraz

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Huaraz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,424

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013