Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ermanno Artale Ciancio, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Huánuco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1933BornNaples, Italy
29 Nov 195825.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
21 Jun 199461.2AppointedBishop of Huánuco, Peru
6 Aug 199461.3Ordained BishopBishop of Huánuco, Peru
17 Sep 200370.4DiedBishop of Huánuco, Peru

MicroData Summary for Ermanno Artale Ciancio:
Bishop Ermanno Artale Ciancio S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Huánuco

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,433
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013