Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emilio Vallebuona Merea, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Huancayo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1930BornLima
30 Nov 195626.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
21 Oct 197545.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Piura, Peru
21 Oct 197545.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Numana
30 Nov 197545.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Numana
18 Jan 197848.0AppointedBishop of Huaraz, Peru
30 Aug 198555.6AppointedArchbishop of Huancayo, Peru
28 Nov 199161.8DiedArchbishop of Huancayo, Peru

MicroData Summary for Emilio Vallebuona Merea:
Archbishop Emilio Vallebuona Merea S.D.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Huancayo

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013