Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Godayol Colom, S.D.B.

Prelate Emeritus of Ayaviri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1943 BornMataró, Spain
13 Aug 197228.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
4 Dec 199148.3AppointedPrelate of Ayaviri, Peru
4 Jan 199248.3Ordained BishopPrelate of Ayaviri, Peru
18 Feb 200662.5ResignedPrelate of Ayaviri, Peru

MicroData Summary for Juan Godayol Colom:
Bishop Juan Godayol Colom S.D.B. (born ) Prelate Emeritus of Ayaviri

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Ayaviri.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,651

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013