Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Prado Perez-Rosas, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Trujillo, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1923Born
13 Jul 195633.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
7 Sep 197047.2AppointedBishop of Chachapoyas, Peru
7 Oct 197047.3Ordained BishopBishop of Chachapoyas, Peru
29 Dec 197653.5AppointedArchbishop of Trujillo, Peru
29 Jul 199976.1RetiredArchbishop of Trujillo, Peru
9 Oct 201188.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Trujillo, Peru

MicroData Summary for Manuel Prado Perez-Rosas
Archbishop Manuel Prado Perez-Rosas S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Trujillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 41.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 10 Oct 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Apr 2017